WA HB2313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing the chiropractic quality assurance commission with additional authority over budget development, spending, and staffing.
Title
Providing the chiropractic quality assurance commission with additional authority over budget development, spending, and staffing.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 215, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-17 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6156 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.