WA HB2313 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.
Title
Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2015-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6157 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2313&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2313.pdf |