WA HB2309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning service contract providers.
Title
Concerning service contract providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 9:15 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-26 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2017-12-20 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6042 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.