WA HB2309 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing fairness and flexibility in the payment of property taxes.
Title
Providing fairness and flexibility in the payment of property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Chapter 13, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-11 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |