WA HB2305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning firearms laws concerning persons subject to vulnerable adult protection orders.
Title
Concerning firearms laws concerning persons subject to vulnerable adult protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |