WA HB2295 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the use of electric or hybrid-electric aircraft for regional air travel.
Title
Encouraging the use of electric or hybrid-electric aircraft for regional air travel.
Sponsors
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-17 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2017-12-15 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |