WA HB2290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying the process for donating low-value surplus property owned by a city-owned utility.
Title
Simplifying the process for donating low-value surplus property owned by a city-owned utility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2017-12-15 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6030 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.