WA HB2285 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing opportunities for accessible and effective family planning.
Title
Increasing opportunities for accessible and effective family planning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-28 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-06-27 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-27 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2285&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2285.pdf |