WA HB2284 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Human Services & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Human Services & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the cost-effective professional development of early learning providers.
Title
Supporting the cost-effective professional development of early learning providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2284&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2284.pdf |