WA HB2283 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging investment in and reducing the costs of transitioning to the clean energy future.
Title
Encouraging investment in and reducing the costs of transitioning to the clean energy future.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |