WA HB2282 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changing provisions relating to the early learning advisory council.
Title
Changing provisions relating to the early learning advisory council.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6520 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-31 - First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.