WA HB2279 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning utilization of developmental disabilities waivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning utilization of developmental disabilities waivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-01-31HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71a10New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2279&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2279.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2279-S.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/2279-S%20AMH%20TAYL%20H3219.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2279%20HBA%20HSEL%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69796
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2279%20HBR%20HSEL%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130749&actionText=HSEL%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31850&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback