WA HB2278 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning personal information privacy protections in government entities.
Title
Concerning personal information privacy protections in government entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-23 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |