WA HB2273 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a study committee on human genome editing.
Title
Creating a study committee on human genome editing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | ITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |