WA HB2265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting lienholders' interests while retaining consumer protections.
Title
Protecting lienholders' interests while retaining consumer protections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6005 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2265&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2265.pdf |