WA HB2264 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning hospital privileges for advanced registered nurse practitioners and physician assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning hospital privileges for advanced registered nurse practitioners and physician assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-20SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-20SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-20SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2018-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-17HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
2017-12-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6067 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback