WA HB2262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning actions for wrongful injury or death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning actions for wrongful injury or death.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01HouseJUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-24HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-23HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2017-12-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6015 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback