WA HB2261 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of science to support significant agency actions.
Title
Concerning the use of science to support significant agency actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Chapter 21, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-31 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |