WA HB2258 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Hearing: Feb 22 @ 1:30 pm in Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health care provider and health care facility whistleblower protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning health care provider and health care facility whistleblower protections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-24HouseJUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2017-12-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5998 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM in anticipation of other legislative action.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback