WA HB2255 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning inversion and diversion of cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning inversion and diversion of cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2024-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2024-02-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2024-02-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-02-09HouseFloor amendment
2024-02-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2024-01-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-01-23HouseRSG - Majority; do pass.
2024-01-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-18HousePublic hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2024-01-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6950New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2255&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2255.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2255.E.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/2255%20AMH%20WATE%20H2993.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2255%20HBA%20RSG%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69207
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2255%20HBR%20RSG%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2255.E%20HBR%20APH%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70874
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130666&actionText=RSG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31759&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=130666&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-09-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2255&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback