WA HB2249 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting privacy and identity by setting data collection, storage, use, and disposal standards.
Title
Protecting privacy and identity by setting data collection, storage, use, and disposal standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2249&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2249.pdf |