WA HB2246 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vacation leave accrual for state employees.
Title
Concerning vacation leave accrual for state employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Sam Low [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] |
Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-18 | House | Chapter 151, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-30 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 40 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 43 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |