WA HB2244 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving retirement security for Washingtonians by establishing Washington saves, an automatic enrollment individual retirement savings account program, and updating the Washington retirement marketplace statute.
Title
Improving retirement security for Washingtonians by establishing Washington saves, an automatic enrollment individual retirement savings account program, and updating the Washington retirement marketplace statute.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Sen. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Frank Chopp [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Sen. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6069 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 330 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 79a | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |