WA HB2242 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting sexual assault survivors at institutions of higher education.
Title
Supporting sexual assault survivors at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | House | PEW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Postsecondary Education & Workforce at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 110 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |