WA HB2242 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Funding fully the state's program of basic education by providing equitable education opportunities through reform of state and local education contributions.
Title
Funding fully the state's program of basic education by providing equitable education opportunities through reform of state and local education contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | House | Effective date 10/19/2017*. |
2017-07-06 | House | Chapter 13, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session PV. |
2017-07-06 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-06-29 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |