WA HB2239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting unjustified employer searches of employee personal vehicles.
Title
Prohibiting unjustified employer searches of employee personal vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6177 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.