WA HB2227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the laboratory testing of marijuana products.
Title
Concerning the laboratory testing of marijuana products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2017-06-16 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |