WA HB2224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing flexibility in high school graduation requirements and supporting student success during the transition to a federal every student succeeds act-compliant accountability system.
Title
Providing flexibility in high school graduation requirements and supporting student success during the transition to a federal every student succeeds act-compliant accountability system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective date 7/7/2017. |
2017-07-07 | House | Chapter 31, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-06-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-06-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-06-19 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-06-19 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2017-06-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5951 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.