WA HB2222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting information obtained to develop or implement an individual health insurance market stability program.
Title
Protecting information obtained to develop or implement an individual health insurance market stability program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective date 7/7/2017. |
2017-07-07 | House | Chapter 30, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 9:45 AM. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | On motion, referred to Health Care. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-06-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-06-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-06-19 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-06-19 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:00 PM. |
2017-06-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5950 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.