WA HB2217 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authority over individuals found guilty of or accused of criminal offenses that occurred when the individual was under age 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning authority over individuals found guilty of or accused of criminal offenses that occurred when the individual was under age 18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-15HouseEffective date 6/6/2024.
2024-03-15HouseChapter 117, 2024 Laws.
2024-03-15HouseGovernor signed.
2024-03-04HouseDelivered to Governor.
2024-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2024-02-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2024-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-02-23SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2024-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2024-02-20SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2024-02-20SenateHS - Majority; do pass.
2024-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM.
2024-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2024-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services.
2024-02-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2024-02-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-02-09House1st substitute bill substituted
2024-02-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2024-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2024-02-02HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2024-01-30HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2024-01-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2024-01-30HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1340110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340300Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2217&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2217.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2217-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/2217-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/2217-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/2217-S%20AMS%20BOEH%20RICS%20201.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/2217-S%20AMS%20GILD%20RICS%20203.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/2217-S%20AMS%20PADD%20RICS%20204.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2217%20HBA%20HSEL%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69206
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69654
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2217%20HBR%20HSEL%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70247
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70375
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=70625
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2217-S%20HBR%20APH%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/2217-S%20SBA%20HS%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/2217-S%20SBR%20HS%20TA%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/2217-S%20SBR%20HS%20OC%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/2217-S%20SBR%20APS%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=71269
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2217-S%20HBR%20PL%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/2217-S%20HBR%20FBR%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130600&actionText=HSEL%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31878&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=130600&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-09-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2217&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=130600&actionText=HS%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31974&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=130600&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2217&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback