WA HB2215 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reconciling election laws.
Title
Reconciling election laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SB6015 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.