WA HB2213 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state agency collection, use, and retention of biometric identifiers.
Title
Concerning state agency collection, use, and retention of biometric identifiers.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017**. |
2017-06-27 | House | Chapter 1, 2017 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2017-06-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-05-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-05-12 | House | First reading, referred to Rules Review. |