WA HB2211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning life insurance products or services that are intended to incent behavioral changes that improve the health and reduce the risk of death of the insured.
Title
Concerning life insurance products or services that are intended to incent behavioral changes that improve the health and reduce the risk of death of the insured.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-15 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6052 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2211&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2211.pdf |