WA HB2210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning health coverage supplementing medicare part D provided through a federally authorized employer group waiver plan.
Title
Concerning health coverage supplementing medicare part D provided through a federally authorized employer group waiver plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6051 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 3/27/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2210&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2210.pdf |