WA HB2207 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the group-wide supervision of internationally active insurance groups.
Title
Addressing the group-wide supervision of internationally active insurance groups.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6048 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.