WA HB2203 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of surplus federal property transferred to local law enforcement agencies.
Title
Concerning the use of surplus federal property transferred to local law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Graham Hunt [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-24 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2203&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2203.pdf |