WA HB2198 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing tax relief to qualifying patients for purchases of marijuana for medical use.
Title
Providing tax relief to qualifying patients for purchases of marijuana for medical use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |