WA HB2197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regional transit authority taxes approved after January 1, 2015, being used only to retire debt.
Title
Concerning regional transit authority taxes approved after January 1, 2015, being used only to retire debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-05 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2197&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2197.pdf |