WA HB2190 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective date 7/7/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing budget stabilization account transfers to the general fund. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Addressing budget stabilization account transfers and appropriations. )
Title
Addressing budget stabilization account transfers to the general fund. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Addressing budget stabilization account transfers and appropriations. )
Sponsors
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective date 7/7/2017. |
2017-07-07 | House | Chapter 29, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-29 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |