WA HB2188 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the provisions relating to the early deportation of illegal alien offenders.
Title
Changing the provisions relating to the early deportation of illegal alien offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass HS 09 bill proposed by Human Services. | |
2009-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-19 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |