WA HB2185 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2014 supplemental operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2014 supplemental operating appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-28 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6002 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-04 - Effective date 4/4/2014.