WA HB2184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring comprehensive sexual health education with an affirmative consent curriculum in all public schools by the 2022-23 school year in accordance with the recommendations of the sexual health education work group.
Title
Requiring comprehensive sexual health education with an affirmative consent curriculum in all public schools by the 2022-23 school year in accordance with the recommendations of the sexual health education work group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | First reading, referred to Education |