WA HB2183 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a curriculum for the prevention of sexual abuse for grades K-12.
Title
Concerning a curriculum for the prevention of sexual abuse for grades K-12.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Kevin Parker [R] |
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Education |