WA HB2173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing ballot drop box accessibility.
Title
Addressing ballot drop box accessibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2173&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2173.pdf |