WA HB2169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing year-round Pacific Standard Time.
Title
Implementing year-round Pacific Standard Time.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Liz Pike [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-21 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2169&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2169.pdf |