WA HB2166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating special license plates that support working forests.
Title
Creating special license plates that support working forests.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |