WA HB2165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vapor products, e-cigarettes, and nicotine products taxation.
Title
Concerning vapor products, e-cigarettes, and nicotine products taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-30 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |