WA HB2158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a workforce education investment to train Washington students for Washington jobs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a workforce education investment to train Washington students for Washington jobs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseEffective date 7/28/2019**.
2019-05-21HouseChapter 406, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-28HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28HousePassed final passage; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-28SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-27SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-27SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2019-04-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-04-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-26HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-26House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-04-26HousePlaced on second reading.
2019-04-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-25HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-04-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 6:00 PM.
2019-04-22HousePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-19HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-19HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-04-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-04-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2158&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2158.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2158-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2158-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2158-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2158-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2158-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120442&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2158&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120442&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2158&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120442&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2158&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback