WA HB2156 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Investing in quality prekindergarten, K-12, and postsecondary opportunities throughout Washington with excise taxes on sales and extraordinary profits of high valued assets.
Title
Investing in quality prekindergarten, K-12, and postsecondary opportunities throughout Washington with excise taxes on sales and extraordinary profits of high valued assets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-19 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |