WA HB2146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the legislature's intent to create and retain local jobs through incentives provided to the aerospace industry by redirecting those incentives to other job creating opportunities if the number of aerospace jobs continues to decline.
Title
Honoring the legislature's intent to create and retain local jobs through incentives provided to the aerospace industry by redirecting those incentives to other job creating opportunities if the number of aerospace jobs continues to decline.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2146&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2146.pdf |